+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 10, 2018 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0762
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2019
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
- Second Reading
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that for professions that have continuing education requirements, the required continuing education hours shall include at least one hour of sexual harassment prevention training for license renewals occurring on or after January 1, 2020. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may adopt rules to implement the provisions.