+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- Re-assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 505/1.1 - from Ch. 23, par. 5001.1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor