+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- 20 ILCS 210/6 - from Ch. 127, par. 1706
- 20 ILCS 665/4b -
- 20 ILCS 1305/10-6 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/6a - from Ch. 127, par. 142a
- 35 ILCS 5/507DDD -
- 35 ILCS 5/507AA rep. -
- 35 ILCS 5/507BB rep. -
- 35 ILCS 5/507TT rep. -
- 35 ILCS 405/13 - from Ch. 120, par. 405A-13
- 235 ILCS 5/1-3.37 rep. -
- 305 ILCS 40/Act rep. -
- 705 ILCS 105/27.1b -
- 705 ILCS 135/15-20 -
- 730 ILCS 5/5-9-1.22 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor