+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On August 10, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0901
- Effective Date August 10, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 11, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Deanna Demuzio
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2004
- Do Pass Education; 006-002-000
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 31, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-013
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael K. Smith
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 012-000-001
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael K. Smith
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that the State Board of Education shall select 7 (instead of 8) school districts to participate in the pilot project, one located in the City of Chicago, 3 located in the area that makes up of the counties of DuPage, Kane, Lake, McHenry, Will, and that portion of Cook County that is located outside of the City of Chicago, and 3 located in the remainder of the State. Provides that the State Board shall, if possible, select at least 9 (instead of 8) schools to participate in the pilot project, with at least 3 from the school district located in the City of Chicago and one from each of the other school districts selected. Makes a technical correction.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2004: HB4944 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 13, 2004
March 26, 2004: HB4944 - Third Reading - Friday, March 26, 2004
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor