+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On April 16, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 012-000-000
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lisa M. Dugan
+ − Vote
April 16, 2008: HB4921 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 16, 2008
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor