+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Pension Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 017-000-001
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Remains in Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 009-003-005
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the driver is required to retake the examination only if he or she has been determined to have been at fault in the accident, as evidenced by the issuance of a Uniform Traffic Citation.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 625 ILCS 5/6-201 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-201
- 625 ILCS 5/6-207 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-207