+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard T. Bradley
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Co-Sponsor Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ralph C. Capparelli
+ − Statute Amended
- 40 ILCS 5/6-222 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 6-222
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor