+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Angelo Saviano
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Suzanne Bassi
On January 15, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias