+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 735 ILCS 5/9-121 -
- 735 ILCS 5/9-122 new -
- 735 ILCS 5/15-1701 - from Ch. 110, par. 15-1701
- 815 ILCS 505/2Z - from Ch. 121 1/2, par. 262Z
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor