+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- New Act -
- 30 ILCS 575/5 - from Ch. 127, par. 132.605
- 220 ILCS 5/5-117 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor