+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 9, 2010 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0916
- Effective Date June 9, 2010
- Governor Approved
On May 26, 2010 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010
- Second Reading
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2010
- Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-001-000
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Aging Committee; 018-000-000
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Aging Committee
On January 15, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eddie Washington