+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor