+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Tabled By Sponsor Rep. William B. Black
- Motion Prevailed
On February 1, 2005 in the House:
- Motion Filed Rep. William B. Black; Table House Bill 49 Pursuant to Rule 60(b)
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 3, 2005 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor