+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- To Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford