+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- New Act -
- 5 ILCS 140/7 - from Ch. 116, par. 207
- 30 ILCS 105/5.930 new -
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor