+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 22, 2006
- Arrive in Senate
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 016-000-000
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 725 ILCS 5/110-4 - from Ch. 38, par. 110-4
- 725 ILCS 5/110-6.4 new -