+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 008-004-000
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. James H. Meyer
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ruth Munson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brent Hassert
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- New Act -
- 815 ILCS 505/2Z - from Ch. 121 1/2, par. 262Z
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor