+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On January 4, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1168
- Effective Date June 1, 2019
- Governor Approved
On December 27, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On November 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 045-003-000
On November 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 15, 2018
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On November 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-043-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions Committee; 008-000-000
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Financial Institutions Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang