+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On August 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2004
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 007-003-000
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-001-011
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robin Kelly
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning child care for TANF recipients, provides that beginning July 1, 2004, the rates paid by the Department of Human Services to all providers of child care services who are exempt from licensure under the Child Care Act of 1969 shall be increased by an amount equal to 2% of the rates in effect on June 30, 2004.
+ − Statute Amended
- 305 ILCS 5/9A-11 - from Ch. 23, par. 9A-11
+ − Vote
March 30, 2004: HB4870 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 30, 2004
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor