+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Mark L. Walker
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 15, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor