+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 13, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0064
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 14, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2007
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Higher Education Committee
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Watson
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Adds Operation Enduring Freedom and Operation Iraqi Freedom (instead of any time on or after September 11, 2001 and until Congress or the President orders that persons in service are no longer eligible for the Global War on Terrorism Expeditionary Medal) to the list of periods of hostilities for which each county shall be entitled, annually, to one honorary scholarship in the University.
+ − Statute Amended
- 110 ILCS 305/9 - from Ch. 144, par. 30
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2007: HB0486 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 16, 2007
April 17, 2007: HB0486 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 17, 2007
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor