+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (56)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0981
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 23, 2004
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs in SA 1,2
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 116-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Health Care Availability and Access Committee; 014-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Health Care Availability and Access Committee; 014-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Availability and Access Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Availability and Access Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1,2
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2004
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2004
- Do Pass as Amended Health & Human Services; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-003-013
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Fiscal Note Filed
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability and Access Committee; 015-000-005
- Assigned to Health Care Availability and Access Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that, in addition to other procedures authorized by the Department under the Illinois Public Aid Code, the Department of Public Aid shall provide reimbursement for certain epidural anesthesia services.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the engrossed bill with the following change. Provides that each hospital shall post written notices of the policy regarding standards of obstetrical care based upon a patient's source of payment or ability to pay for medical services in the obstetrical admitting areas of the hospital by July 1, 2004 (rather than July 1, 2003).
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the engrossed bill with the following change. Provides that each hospital shall post written notices of the policy regarding standards of obstetrical care based upon a patient's source of payment or ability to pay for medical services in the obstetrical admitting areas of the hospital by July 1, 2004 (rather than July 1, 2003).