+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. William B. Black
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. William B. Black
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 007-001-000
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy
On January 15, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/17-122 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 17-122
- 30 ILCS 805/8.34 new -