+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-039-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-011-000
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-011-000
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Gender Violence Act. Defines "employee", "employer", "work environment", and "workplace". Changes the definition of "gender-related violence" to include domestic violence. Provides that an employer shall only be liable for gender-related violence committed in the work environment by an employee or agent of the employer. Provides specific instances in which an employer is liable for gender-related violence. Provides that no person shall have the power to waive any provisions of the Act as part of a dissolution of marriage agreement, civil union, domestic partnership, or custody agreement. Makes corresponding changes.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2022: HB4850 - Third Reading
March 3, 2022: HFA0002 - Labor & Commerce
February 16, 2022: HB4850 - Labor & Commerce
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor