+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (65)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 31, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On July 15, 2004 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) JULY 31, 2004
On July 9, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Carolyn H. Krause
On June 30, 2004 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 15, 2004
On June 8, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan
On June 1, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 5
- Arrived in House
On May 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Adopted Executive; 009-000-003
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Luechtefeld
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Haine
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 047-009-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On May 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Sen. Frank C. Watson; -Luechtefeld-Dillard-Pursuant to Senate Rule 7-9, discharge the Senate Executive Committee from further consideration of Senate Floor Amendment Number 4, and that this amendment be approved for consideration.
- Motion Filed Sen. Frank C. Watson; -Luechtefeld-Dillard- Pursuant to Senate Rule 7-9, discharge the Senate Executive Committee from further consideration of Senate Floor Amendments Numbered 1, 2 & 3, and that these amendments be approved for consideration.
On May 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Susan Garrett
On May 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Executive
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 added as a co-sponsor-Senator Haine
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Sen. Frank C. Watson; -Luechtefeld-Dillard-Pursuant to Senate Rule 7-9, Senate Rules discharge Floor Amendment Number 4 and be referred to the Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Motion Filed Sen. Frank C. Watson; -Luechtefeld-Dillard-Pursuant to Senate Rule 7-9, Senate Rules discharge Floor Amendment's Numbered 1, 2 & 3, and be referred to the Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On May 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Denny Jacobs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Denny Jacobs; -Watson-Luechtefeld-Dillard
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Denny Jacobs; -Watson-Luechtefeld-Dillard
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Denny Jacobs; -Watson-Luechtefeld-Dillard
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2004
- Do Pass Insurance & Pensions; 010-000-000
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance & Pensions
On March 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability and Access Committee; 020-000-000
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Availability and Access Committee
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen May
+ − Adopted Amendments (6)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2004: HB4847 - Third Reading - Monday, May 31, 2004
March 25, 2004: HB4847 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor