+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-005-000
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2022: HB4843 - Third Reading
February 16, 2022: HB4843 - State Government Administration
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor