+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor