+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 7, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0788
- Effective Date August 7, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 18, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2008
- Do Pass Transportation; 009-000-000
On April 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 11, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Drivers Education & Safety Committee; 006-003-000
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Drivers Education & Safety Committee
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Renée Kosel
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 625 ILCS 5/11-604 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-604
- P.A. 95-574, Sec. 90 new -