+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 14, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0730
- Effective Date July 14, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 9, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2004
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 25, 2004
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Delgado
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carole Pankau
- Sponsor Removed Rep. William Delgado
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carole Pankau
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Delgado
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that an "area project" must be a not-for-profit organization (instead of a not-for-profit organization or local board). Deletes provisions requiring the Department of Public Health to review contracts for community service programs to ensure compliance and deletes provisions concerning the renewal of these contracts. Deletes a provision stating that the funding of new programs is based on the availability of new, additional funding. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2004: HB4831 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 11, 2004
February 24, 2004: HB4831 - Third Reading - Tuesday, February 24, 2004
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor