+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 10, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 1, 2023
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1069
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 002
Specifies that every original application (currently, application) shall bear the signature of the owner and restores provisions requiring such a signature to be written in pen and ink. Expands the applicability of the amendatory language to allow a parent of a child with a communication disorder to disclose that the child has a health condition or disability that may impede effective communication with a peace officer. Adds an effective date of July 1, 2023.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 625 ILCS 5/3-405 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-405
- 625 ILCS 5/3-405.5 new
+ − Votes (5)
March 30, 2022: HB4825 - Third Reading
March 22, 2022: HB4825 - Transportation
March 3, 2022: HB4825 - Third Reading
February 24, 2022: HFA0002 - Transportation: Regulation, Roads
February 10, 2022: HB4825 - Transportation: Regulation, Roads
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor