+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On May 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 7, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On April 30, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
On April 16, 2008 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Disability Services Committee; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Disability Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Disability Services Committee
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Disability Services Committee
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/14-8.03 - from Ch. 122, par. 14-8.03
+ − Vote
April 30, 2008: HB4822 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 30, 2008
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor