+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (59)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0631
- Effective Date August 19, 2005
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 114-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John E. Bradley
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John E. Bradley
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1,2
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Dillard
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Health & Human Services; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2005
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2005
- Do Pass as Amended Health & Human Services; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Harry Osterman
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley
+ − Adopted Amendments (6)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Creates the Newborn Eye Pathology Act. Provides policy and legislative findings. Establishes the Newborn Eye Pathology Screening Advisory Committee and sets forth duties for the Advisory Committee. Requires the Department of Human Services to adopt the protocol developed by the American Academy of Pediatrics to optimally detect the presence of treatable causes of blindness in infants by 2 months of age. Requires hospitals to conduct eye screenings of newborns prior to discharge. Provides that the Act shall not be construed to supersede the clinical judgment of the licensed health care provider or a parent or guardian of a newborn who objects to the examination on the grounds that the examination conflicts with his or her religious beliefs or practices. Requires hospitals to report information about each child with a positive eye screening result to the Illinois Department of Public Health. Requires the Illinois Department of Public Health to maintain a registry of cases of positive eye screening results, including information needed for the purpose of follow-up service. Requires the Department of Human Services to adopt rules. Effective July 1, 2005.
House Committee Amendment No. 2
Provides that a duty of the Advisory Committee is to conduct training for hospitals implementing newborn eye pathology (rather than hearing) screening.
House Floor Amendment No. 4
Deletes everything. Creates the Newborn Eye Pathology Act. Provides policy. Establishes the Newborn Eye Pathology Advisory Committee and sets forth duties for the Advisory Committee. Requires all hospitals to report information on all congenital abnormalities or diseases of the eye detected in newborns prior to discharge from the hospital to the Department of Public Health. Requires the Department of Public Health to maintain a registry of cases of reported congenital abnormalities or diseases of the eye in newborns, including information needed for the purpose of follow-up service. Provides that any person or hospital making a report shall be immune from any civil or criminal liability that may result by reason of making a report, except for willful or wanton misconduct. Requires the Department of Public Health to adopt rules. Effective July 1, 2005.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Includes in the Newborn Eye Pathology Advisory Committee an optometrist with a background in or experience with pupil dilation in infants and red reflex screening for intraocular pathology.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Includes in the Newborn Eye Pathology Advisory Committee an optometrist with a background in or experience with pupil dilation in infants and red reflex screening for intraocular pathology.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -