+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2023
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0711
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Instead of requiring an applicant for a Substitute Teaching License to hold a bachelor's degree or higher from a regionally accredited institution of higher education, allows an applicant to be enrolled in an approved educator preparation program in this State and have earned at least 90 credit hours.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (5)
March 30, 2022: HB4798 - Third Reading
March 22, 2022: HB4798 - Education
March 3, 2022: HB4798 - Third Reading
February 24, 2022: HFA0001 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
February 16, 2022: HB4798 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor