+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-001
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Revenue Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue Committee; 003-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 012-000-000
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur L. Turner
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Decreases the amount of the annual cap on the credits from $40,000,000 to $10,000,000. Provides that neither the Governor nor any agency or agency head under the jurisdiction of the Governor has any rulemaking authority under the Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -