+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Tabled
- Motion Prevailed
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Carol Sente
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 65 ILCS 5/10-1-7.3 -
- 65 ILCS 5/10-2.1-4 - from Ch. 24, par. 10-2.1-4
- 70 ILCS 705/16.04b -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor