+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 10, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0900
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
- Governor Approved
On June 11, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Held in Judiciary
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank Aguilar
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the court may sentence an offender to an extended term sentence for first degree murder if the trier of fact finds beyond a reasonable doubt that the murder was accompanied by exceptionally brutal or heinous behavior indicative of wanton cruelty or that any of the aggravating factors listed in first degree murder statute were found to be present.