+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Motion Withdrawn Rep. William B. Black
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b) Rep. William B. Black
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the bill with the following changes. Changes the title of the Act to the Appropriation for Military Scholarships Act. Removes the provisions requiring annual General Revenue Fund appropriations by the General Assembly sufficient to reimburse institutions of higher learning in this State for not charging students tuition and fees under the Veteran Grant program, the Illinois National Guard Grant and Naval Militia Grant program, and the MIA/POW Scholarship program and requiring an irrevocable and continuing appropriation if the General Assembly fails to make sufficient appropriations. Effective July 1, 2007.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Vote
March 28, 2007: HB0479 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 28, 2007
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor