+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Held in Revenue
On April 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Revenue Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue Committee; 003-000-000
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes the provision changing the definition of "household income" to include only the income of the applicant and his or her spouse.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 9, 2008: HB4788 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 09, 2008
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor