+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On August 13, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0938
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
On June 18, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 110-001-001
On May 18, 2004 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Frank Aguilar
On May 14, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Munoz
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Judiciary; 006-000-000
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2004
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Munoz
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Held in Judiciary
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Munoz
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 010-000-000
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank Aguilar
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank Aguilar
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Changes the penalty for the offense from a Class 4 felony to a Class 1 felony. Includes in the definition of school grounds a school yard, school playing field, and school playground.
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Changes the penalty for the offense from a Class 4 felony to a Class 1 felony. Includes in the definition of school grounds a school yard, school playing field, and school playground.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
May 20, 2004: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Thursday, May 20, 2004
May 13, 2004: HB4788 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 13, 2004
March 25, 2004: HB4788 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor