+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 720 ILCS 5/9-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 9-1
- 730 ILCS 5/5-8-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-8-1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor