+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2023
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0955
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 6, 2022
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Assigned to State Government
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 014-000-000
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
+ − Statute Amended
- 15 ILCS 30/1 - from Ch. 127, par. 293.1