+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 27, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0819
- Effective Date July 27, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 9, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 019-000-000
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
+ − Statute Amended
- 725 ILCS 120/6 - from Ch. 38, par. 1406
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2004: HB4777 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 11, 2004
March 24, 2004: HB4777 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 24, 2004
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor