+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On August 20, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0958
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 20, 2004
On June 23, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 010-000-000
On May 24, 2004 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lisa M. Dugan
On May 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
- Recalled to Second Reading
On May 19, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
On May 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On May 19, 2004 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Judiciary; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2004
- Second Reading
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lisa M. Dugan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that a sample analysis of a victim of sexual assault to determine if the person has been administered a controlled substance without his or her consent may not be performed unless the victim returns a signed written authorization within 30 days (rather than 48 hours) after the sample was collected.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that a sample analysis of a victim of sexual assault to determine if the person has been administered a controlled substance without his or her consent may not be performed unless the victim returns a signed written authorization within 30 days (rather than 48 hours) after the sample was collected.
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/12-18 - from Ch. 38, par. 12-18
+ − Votes (3)
May 25, 2004: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Tuesday, May 25, 2004
May 19, 2004: HB4771 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 19, 2004
March 23, 2004: HB4771 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 23, 2004
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor