+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 108-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 012-000-001
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Tryon
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Requires that the website include a database of all current State contracts, sorted separately by contractor name, awarding officer or agency, contract value, and goods or services provided.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 1, 2008: HB4765 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 01, 2008
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor