+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018
- To Civil Procedure Subcommittee
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- To Civil Procedure Subcommittee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 735 ILCS 5/9-121 -
- 735 ILCS 5/9-122 new -
- 815 ILCS 505/2Z - from Ch. 121 1/2, par. 262Z
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor