+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On May 31, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2014
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Judiciary; 008-008-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 010-006-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 001
Exempts from a violation, a person actually engaged in the business of manufacturing and selling any piece or part of a firearm to a person who possesses a license to manufacture firearms under the federal Gun Control Act of 1968, but only with respect to the activities which are within the lawful scope of that business.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor