+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Avery Bourne
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. Avery Bourne
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Avery Bourne
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 005-003-001
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez