+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Re-Referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Registration and Regulation Committee; 008-008-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Registration and Regulation Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Registration and Regulation Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Registration and Regulation Committee; 021-000-001
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Registration and Regulation Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Registration and Regulation Committee
- Remains in Registration and Regulation Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Registration and Regulation Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Registration and Regulation Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Registration and Regulation Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Registration and Regulation Committee
- Re-assigned to Registration and Regulation Committee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced with the following changes. Provides for the regulation of residential building contractors and specialty residential building contractors (rather than general building contractors and specialty contractors). Changes all references from "general building contractor" to "residential building contractor" and from "specialty contractor" to "specialty residential contractor", including changing the name of the new Act to the Residential Building Contractor Licensing Act. Effective January 1, 2008.
House Committee Amendment No. 2
Exempts from the Residential Building Contractor Licensing Act a person who is licensed as a residential building contractor or licensed in a similar profession by a municipality engaged in the licensure of residential building contractors or similar persons before the effective date of the new Act and who practices the profession within that municipality.
House Committee Amendment No. 2
Exempts from the Residential Building Contractor Licensing Act a person who is licensed as a residential building contractor or licensed in a similar profession by a municipality engaged in the licensure of residential building contractors or similar persons before the effective date of the new Act and who practices the profession within that municipality.