+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eileen Lyons
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John J. Millner
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/12-18 - from Ch. 38, par. 12-18
+ − Vote
March 24, 2004: HB4739 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 24, 2004
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor