+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- To SPECIAL Issues Subcommittee
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sonya M. Harper
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.25g - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.25g
- 105 ILCS 5/27-6 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor